Case Information: 38818 | |||
Short Caption: | CAVALRY INVESTMENTS VS. HUFF | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A438700 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/14/2001 / Turner, William | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/26/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Blalock & Associates--check no. 47544. | ||
11/26/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-19744 | |
12/13/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-20993 | |
12/14/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: William C. Turner. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/19/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. William C. Turner. | ||
03/25/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 02-05255 | |
04/18/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 02-06908 | |
04/29/2002 | Settlement Program Motion/Stipulation | Filed Settlement Program/Stipulated Dismissal. | 02-07510 | |
05/09/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs and attorney fees. NRAP 42(b) . NNP/CLK | 02-08108 | |
05/09/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |