Case Heading (S-17-0079) | |||||
Case Number: | S-17-0079 | Case Docketed On: | 03/15/2017 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Seventh Judicial District Natrona County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509 | ||
Short Title: | TAMANI T'ANGELIS THOMPSON v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | TAMANI T'ANGELIS THOMPSON, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Tamani T'Angelis Thompson | Diane M. Lozano Kirk Allan Morgan |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Christyne Marie Martens Caitlin Frances Harper |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Sentencing, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence, Evidence |
Opinion Number: | 2018 WY 3 |
Citation: | 408 P.3d 756 (Wyo. 2018) |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
03/15/2017 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
03/15/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
03/15/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
04/27/2017 | Motion - Extension of time - brief | Motion | Extension of time - brief | Final | |
04/28/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for Extension of Time to File Brief | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/28/2017 | Order Granting Appellant's Request for Extension to File Brief | Order | Grant - extension of time | Final | |
05/26/2017 | Motion - Correct record | Motion | Correct record | Final | |
05/30/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Appellant's Motion to Correct or Modify the Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/01/2017 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/02/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellant; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/09/2017 | Response to Appellant's Motion to Correct or Complete the Record | Response/Objection | Other | Final | |
06/12/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Appellant's Motion to Correct or Complete the Record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
06/20/2017 | Order Granting Motion to Modify the Record | Order | Grant | Final | |
07/19/2017 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
07/21/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/09/2017 | Order - Oral argument scheduled | Order | Oral argument scheduled | Final | |
09/20/2017 | Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Hill, Davis, Fox and Kautz (Tina N. Olson obo Appellant; Caitlin Harper obo Appellee) and taken under advisement | Notice-Internal | Oral argument notice | Final | |
10/24/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal (request faxed and sent via mail to clerk) | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
10/27/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
10/27/2017 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal received from district court clerk, five volumes. Volumes 1-2 - Original Papers; Volume 3 - Transcripts (8 total); Volume 4 - Confidential folder; Volume 5 - Exhibits (numerous paper exhibits) | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
10/27/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
12/12/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Entry of appearance - Kirk A. Morgan obo Appellant | Notice-Incoming | Entry of appearance | Final | |
12/12/2017 | Motion - Withdrawal of counsel - Tina N. Olson | Motion | Withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
12/13/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to Withdraw (Olson) and Entry of Appearance (Morgan) | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
12/13/2017 | Order Allowing Withdrawal of Counsel (Olson, appointing Morgan) | Order | Granting withdrawal of counsel | Final | |
01/17/2018 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, with Justice Kautz writing for the court. | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
02/02/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
02/02/2018 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
02/02/2018 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
02/02/2018 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
02/07/2018 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 2/5/2018 by Savannah Shaffer | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |