Case: 01-97-00953-CR
01-97-00953-CR
09/10/1997
Other Felony
Tran, Hoang Vu
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/26/2018 | Document Received | | |
07/23/1999 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
07/23/1999 | Mandate issued - criminal or civil | | |
07/14/1999 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
04/02/1999 | Motion for Rehearing Due | | |
03/18/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
03/18/1999 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
06/24/1998 | Submitted | | |
06/24/1998 | Submission | | |
06/24/1998 | Submitted | | |
05/15/1998 | Submission | | |
03/12/1998 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
03/11/1998 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
03/11/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
03/11/1998 | Case ready to be set | | |
02/27/1998 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
02/13/1998 | Brief Due | | |
01/14/1998 | Brief filed-oral argument has been requested | | |
01/14/1998 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
12/19/1997 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
12/04/1997 | Motion to extend time to file brief disposed. | Grant motion | |
11/19/1997 | Motion to withdraw and substitute attorney disposed | Grant motion | |
11/17/1997 | Motion to extend time to file brief filed. | | |
11/16/1997 | Brief Due | | |
10/20/1997 | Record due | | |
10/17/1997 | Clerk's record filed (transcript) | | |
09/26/1997 | Statement of facts filed | | |
09/17/1997 | Motion to withdraw and substitute counsel filed | | |
09/10/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | | |
08/21/1997 | Date of Sentence in Criminal Case | | |
08/21/1997 | Notice of appeal filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/23/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
State | Court reporter | |
State | Trial court judge | |
TRAN, HOANG VU | Criminal - Appellant | Dick Wheelan |
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | Kevin P. Yeary John B. Holmes |
State | District clerk |
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
Honorable WILLIAM T. HARMON
740661
60 Years TDC