Case: 02-97-00275-CV
02-97-00275-CV
09/09/1997
Injunction
Coleson, James and Mary
Aames Capital Corporation, MSK Financial Services, Inc. d/b/a Accredited Home Lenders and Wendover Funding, Inc.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
03/25/2009 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
03/26/1998 | Mandate Issued | | |
01/15/1998 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Denied | |
01/15/1998 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
12/03/1997 | Other Document Received | | |
12/03/1997 | Submitted | | |
12/03/1997 | Supplemental Brief Filed | | |
12/03/1997 | Submission | | |
11/24/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
11/24/1997 | Case ready to be set | | |
11/10/1997 | Response Filed | | |
11/03/1997 | Brief Filed | | |
10/31/1997 | Motion Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/31/1997 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
10/30/1997 | Motion Filed | | |
10/30/1997 | Motion for Extension to File Brief Filed | | |
09/30/1997 | Received Clerk's Affidavit or Letter | | |
09/30/1997 | Request for Extension of Clerk's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/30/1997 | Request for Extension of Reporter's Record | Motion or Writ Granted | |
09/30/1997 | Submission | | |
09/19/1997 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
09/19/1997 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
09/09/1997 | Received Reporter's Record Affidavit or Letter | | |
09/09/1997 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/25/2009 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Coleson, Mary | Appellant | James W. Coleson |
Accredited Home Lenders | Appellee | J. Allen Smith |
Wendover Funding, Inc. | Appellee | J. Allen Smith |
MSK Financial Services, Inc. | Appellee | J. Allen Smith |
Coleson, James | Appellant | James W. Coleson |
Aames Capital Corporation, Inc. | Appellee | J. Allen Smith |
Trial Court Information
Honorable Don R. Windle
TI-96-00537-C