judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 14-81-00725-CR
14-81-00725-CR
12/11/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Barron, Joseph Richard
Texas, The State of
No
West Publishing
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
05/11/1984Mandate Issued
05/11/1984Record RETURNED from Higher Court
05/11/1984Mandate Issued
04/18/1984Petition for Discretionary ReviewDENIED
12/27/1983Petition for Discretionary Review
11/10/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
11/10/1983Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/27/1983Submission
10/27/1983Submission
10/27/1983Submitted
07/21/1983Case ready to be set
06/28/1983Case ready to be set
06/28/1983Case ready to be set
06/23/1982No description available.
06/23/1982No description available.
05/20/1982No description available.GRANTED
04/26/1982AM CUR, OTHER,
04/01/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
02/11/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
01/07/1982Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STAGRANTED
12/11/1981Record Filed (Both records FILED)
12/11/1981Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process
11/07/1980Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/11/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantKen J. McLean
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
240th District Court
Fort Bend
11,871
20 yrs. & $10,000 fine