judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

NEAL, JERRY

Case Information: 82-CF-1399
Short Caption:NEAL, JERRYClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:10/18/1982

Opening Event Date:10/18/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:03/09/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:07/20/1983
Argued/Submitted:11/08/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Glenn E. Knierim NN
AppellantJerry Neal NPro SeN
AppellantJohn Doe N
Thomas K. Clancy NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Michael W. Farrell NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901NEAL, JERRY IN THE MATTER OF:
01/01/1906 KNIERIMG WITHDRAWN CLANCYT TO FILE REH. PETITION
10/18/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
03/09/1983FiledRecord Completed
07/20/1983FiledBriefing Completed
11/08/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
04/16/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition