Case Heading (S-17-0119) | |||||
Case Number: | S-17-0119 | Case Docketed On: | 04/28/2017 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Sixth Judicial District Campbell County | Case Type: | Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060 | ||
Short Title: | NATHANIEL VANCE FARNSWORTH v. THE STATE OF WYOMING | ||||
Full Title: | NATHANIEL VANCE FARNSWORTH, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff). |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Appellant | Nathaniel Vance Farnsworth | Diane M. Lozano Tina N. Olson David E. Westling |
Appellee | The State of Wyoming | Peter K. Michael David L. Delicath Christyne Marie Martens |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | Criminal Law -Crimes, Criminal Law -Guilty plea |
Opinion Number: | 2017 WY 137 |
Citation: | 405 P.3d 1067 |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
04/28/2017 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
04/28/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record completion notice from district court | Final | |
04/28/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letter | Notice-Outgoing | Docketing letter | Final | |
06/15/2017 | Brief - Appellant | Brief | Appellant | Final | |
06/16/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of appellant and copy of designation of record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/01/2017 | Brief - Appellee | Brief | Appellee | Final | |
08/03/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee and copy of designation of record | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
08/04/2017 | Notice-Internal - Brief only recommendation | Notice-Internal | Brief only recommendation | Final | |
08/22/2017 | Order - Assigning to brief only docket | Order | Assigning to brief only docket | Final | |
08/22/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appeal | Notice-Outgoing | Request for transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/28/2017 | Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district court | Notice-Incoming | Record transmittal notice from district court | Final | |
08/28/2017 | Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, four volumes. Volumes 1-2 - Original Papers; Volume 3 - Transcripts (6 total); Volume 4 - Confidential file | Record | Transmitted record on appeal | Final | |
08/28/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filed | Notice-Outgoing | Transmitted record on appeal filed | Final | |
11/20/2017 | Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with Justice Davis writing for the court | Opinion | Opinion and journal order | Final | |
12/06/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Mandate | Notice-Outgoing | Mandate | Final | |
12/06/2017 | Record - Record returned to district court | Record | Record returned to district court | Final | |
12/06/2017 | Notice-Outgoing - Record return letter | Notice-Outgoing | Record return letter | Final | |
12/06/2017 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final | |
12/11/2017 | Service - Certified mail signature return card - Received by Cheryl Chitwoood on 12/08/2017 | Service | Certified mail signature return card | Final |