judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

JASON E. MILLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-17-0104)
Parent:S-17-0104Case Docketed On:04/10/2017
Consolidated: S-17-0340
Status:Closed
Original Court:Fourth Judicial District Sheridan CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Controlled Substances 35-7-1001 - 35-7-1060
Short Title:JASON E. MILLER v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:JASON E. MILLER, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantJason E. MillerDiane M. Lozano
Christopher Grant Humphrey
Kirk Allan Morgan
AppelleeThe State of WyomingPeter K. Michael
Christyne Marie Martens
Caitlin Frances Harper
Daniel Perry Solish

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Counsel, Criminal Law -Guilty plea, Criminal Law -Speedy Trial
Opinion Number:2018 WY 102
Citation:424 P.3d 1284

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/10/2017Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/10/2017Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/10/2017Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
05/25/2017Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/26/2017Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
05/26/2017Notice-Incoming - ErrataNotice-IncomingErrataFinal
05/30/2017Order - Grant - extension of time to file brief of appellantOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
05/30/2017Event - Hardcopy received - Notice of Errata in Motion to Extend Time to FileEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/28/2017Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/29/2017Event - Hardcopy received - Motion for extension of time to file Appellant's briefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
06/30/2017Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
07/25/2017Motion - Extension of time - briefMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
07/25/2017Event - Hardcopy received - Third Motion for Extension of Time to File BriefEventHardcopy receivedFinal
07/25/2017Order Granting Appellant's Request for Extension to File Brief (No further extensions considered).OrderGrant - third extension of timeFinal
08/11/2017Notice-Incoming - Status report - other (Rule 21 Motion)Notice-IncomingStatus report - otherFinal
08/14/2017Order - Stay briefingOrderStay briefingFinal
08/14/2017Event - Hardcopy received - W.R.A.P. Rule 21 Motion Withdraw Please Based on Ineffective Assistance of CounselEventHardcopy receivedFinal
11/13/2017Notice-Incoming - District Court Pleading - Order denying motion to withdraw no contest pleasNotice-IncomingDistrict Court PleadingFinal
12/27/2017Order Lifting Stay, Consolidating Appeals and Setting Briefing ScheduleOrderLifting StayFinal
02/12/2018Brief - AppellantBriefAppellantFinal
02/13/2018Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of AppellantEventHardcopy receivedFinal
03/29/2018Brief - AppelleeBriefAppelleeFinal
03/30/2018Event - Hardcopy received - Brief of Appellee; and received copy of designation of record on appealEventHardcopy receivedFinal
04/16/2018Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
04/16/2018Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
04/19/2018Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting received by Daniel Solish obo appelleeNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
04/23/2018Notice-Incoming - Record transmittal notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord transmittal notice from district courtFinal
04/23/2018Record - Transmitted record on appeal from district court clerk, five volumes (Volumes 1-3 - Original Papers; Volume 4 - Transcripts (14); Volume 5 - Confidential File)RecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
04/23/2018Notice-Outgoing - Transmitted record on appeal filedNotice-OutgoingTransmitted record on appeal filedFinal
04/24/2018Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Christopher Humphrey o/b/o AppellantNotice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
05/16/2018Notice-Internal - Oral argument notice, argued before Chief Justice Burke, Justices Davis, Fox, Kautz and Boomgaarden (Christopher G. Humphrey o/b/o Appellant; Daniel P. Solish o/b/o Appellee) and taken under advisementNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
08/30/2018Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming with Justice Burke writing for the courtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
09/17/2018Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
09/17/2018Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
09/17/2018Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
09/17/2018Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
09/21/2018Service - Certified mail signature return card - Record signed for 9/19/2018 by Mike MorrisServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal