Case Information: 38855 | |||
Short Caption: | LANDERS VS. BRONLEY | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A421091 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 12/10/2001 / Richitt, E. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
11/30/2001 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Greenman Goldberg Raby & Martinez--check no. 47472. | ||
11/30/2001 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 01-20094 | |
11/30/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days | ||
12/10/2001 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: E. Paul Richitt, Jr. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
12/17/2001 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 01-21193 | |
12/20/2001 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. E. Paul Ritchitt, Jr. | ||
12/28/2001 | Motion | Filed Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 01-21811 | |
01/07/2002 | Motion | Filed Response to Motion. Opposition to Respondent's Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 02-00384 | |
01/07/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. (Copy of amended docketing statement mailed to settlement judge.) | 02-00392 | |
05/06/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The settlement conference is continued to the following date: June 19, 2002. | 02-07931 | |
07/12/2002 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties have agreed to a settlement of this matter. | 02-11986 | |
07/29/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. The settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties have agreed to a settlement. Appellant shall have 30 days to file a stipulation or motion to dismiss or otherwise inform this court of the status of this appeal. | 02-12941 | |
08/13/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation of Dismissal with Prejudice. | 02-13826 | |
08/27/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Stipulated Dismissal. Pursuant to the settlement conference, the stipulation of the parties and cause appearing, " . . . this appeal is dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. fn1[Respondents' December 28, 2001 motion to dismiss is denied as moot.] NRAP 42(b). SNP/CLK | 02-14677 | |
08/27/2002 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |