judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PECCOLE VS. STODDART

Case Information: 38854
Short Caption:PECCOLE VS. STODDARTCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A394528Classification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:BeckerCase Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:12/10/2001 / Goldberg, AubreySP Status:Completed
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
11/30/2001Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Cook & Kelesis--check no. 7157.
11/30/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Settlement. Notice re: settlement conference program/suspension of rules mailed to all counsel. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) 01-20071
11/30/2001Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to File Case Appeal Statement. Due Date: 10 days
12/03/2001Transcript RequestFiled Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: October 22, 2001. To Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. 01-20155
12/10/2001Settlement NoticeIssued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: Aubrey Goldberg. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.)
12/13/2001TranscriptFiled Transcript. Proceedings: October 22, 2001. Court Reporter: Paula Walsh. 01-20999
12/14/2001Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Case Appeal Statement. Filed in district court on: November 28, 2001. 01-21053
12/14/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Certificate of Compliance. 01-21055
12/17/2001Docketing StatementFiled Docketing Statement. 01-21158
12/19/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Aubrey Goldberg.
12/20/2001Notice/Outgoing Letter. Aubrey Goldberg.
02/04/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Notice. Notice of Filing Bankruptcy. 02-02257
02/06/2002Settlement Program ReportFiled Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. 02-02424
04/30/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Order Staying Appeal. We order this appeal stayed pursuant to the mandatory provisions of federal bankruptcy law. Appellant shall have 120 days from the date of this order to file a report informing this court of the status of bankruptcy proceedings. 02-07652
08/19/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Bankruptcy Status Report of David Stoddart. 02-14084
09/10/2002Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Appellant filed a status report on August 19, 2002, informing this court that respondent's bankruptcy proceedings remain unresolved. Fn1[Our order entered April 30, 2002, inadvertently directed appellant to file the status report.] Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, respondent shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 90 days from the date of this order. That report, and all subsequent reports, if any, shall inform this court whether the bankruptcy proceeding is continuing and, in addition, shall specifically state whether this appeal continues to be stayed pursuant to the automatic bankruptcy stay mandated by 11 U.S.C. §362(a). 02-15652
09/23/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Proof of Service. Certificate of Fax/Mailing. 02-16417
12/18/2002Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 02-21658
03/31/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Status report of the bankruptcy proceedings due from respondent: 90 days from the date of this order. 03-05285
07/03/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 03-11196
07/24/2003Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Appellant shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 90 days from the date of this order. That report, and all subsequent reports, if any, shall inform this court whether the bankruptcy proceeding is continuing and, in addition, shall specifically state whether this appeal continues to be stayed pursuant to the automatic bankruptcy stay mandated by 11 U.S.C. §362(a). 03-12517
10/27/2003Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 03-17947
11/17/2003OtherDisqualification of Justice Becker. Sat in district court proceedings in related case.
12/15/2003Settlement Order/ProceduralFiled Order: No Settlement/Briefing Stayed. And Directing the Filing of a Status Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. The settlement proceedings are concluded. Pursuant to NRAP 16(g), the settlement judge has filed a report indicating that the parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Accordingly, the settlement proceedings are concluded. On April 30, 2002, this court ordered this appeal stayed pursuant to the mandatory provisions of federal bankruptcy law. Respondent's most recent status report indicates that the bankruptcy proceeding is still pending. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, counsel for respondent shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 90 days from the date of this order. 03-20766
03/16/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 04-04998
03/30/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Continuing Bankruptcy Stay. Respondent shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 90 days from the date of this order. If respondent reports that this appeal may proceed, he shall attach to the report any relevant orders or filings from the bankruptcy proceeding. 04-05944
07/01/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 04-12138
07/22/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Continuing Bankruptcy Stay. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, respondent shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 90 days from the date of this order. 04-13285
11/12/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 04-20824
12/07/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Continuing Bankruptcy Stay. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, respondent shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 90 days from the date of this order. 04-22254
12/17/2004Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 04-23069
12/29/2004Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Continuing Bankruptcy Stay. Because this matter remains on this court's active docket, respondent shall file an updated report informing this court of the status of the bankruptcy proceedings within 90 days from the date of this order. 04-23656
03/14/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 05-04971
06/06/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Continuing Bankruptcy Stay. Status Report due: 90 days. 05-10993
11/15/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Bankruptcy status report from appellant due: 15 days. Failure to comply timely with this order may result in the imposition of sanctions. 05-22464
11/23/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. Bankruptcy status report from respondent. 05-23113
11/30/2005Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 05-23487
12/13/2005Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Status Report. Bankruptcy status report from respondent due: 90 days. 05-24315
03/09/2006Notice/IncomingFiled Status Report. 06-05191
05/23/2006Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "Cause appearing, we dismiss this appeal. This dismissal is without prejudice to appellant's right to move for reinstatement." NNP06R-RR/MD/RP 06-10859
06/20/2006RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 06-10964
06/20/2006Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
06/29/2006RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 26, 2006. 06-10964
07/11/2006Other Returned Mail. Remittitur addressed to attorney Robert Kelley remailed to corrected address.