Case: 08-81-00299-CR
08-81-00299-CR
12/14/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Lara, Ricardo Castillo
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/05/1984 | Shuck purged | | |
11/12/1982 | Mandate Issued | | |
08/26/1982 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
04/09/1982 | Submitted | | |
03/31/1982 | Submission | | |
12/14/1981 | Brief Filed | | |
12/14/1981 | Brief Filed | | |
12/14/1981 | Record filed. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
11/12/1982 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Unknown | Criminal - Appellant | |
Unknown | Criminal - State of Texas |
Trial Court Information
210th District Court
El Paso
Honorable Sam M. Paxson
35981-210
40 yrs.