judyrecords

591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01309-CR
05-81-01309-CR
12/15/1981
Theft
Johnny Gooden
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
09/14/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
06/29/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/11/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
05/03/1983Order enteredStayed
04/26/1983Letter issued by the court
04/04/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
09/14/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
06/29/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
03/05/1982Clerks record filed
12/15/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
04/04/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Gooden, Johnny RayCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
282nd Judicial District Court
Dallas
Honorable Dallas District Judge, 282nd District Court
F81-30577-IS
10 years