Case: 12-98-00310-CV
12-98-00310-CV
12/10/1998
Habeas Corpus
Torrez, In Re: Florentino Gomez, Jr.
Yes
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
06/17/2008 | Case file was destroyed per retention schedule | | |
12/13/1999 | petition for review filed | | |
02/17/1999 | Case stored | | |
02/11/1999 | Motion for rehearing was not filed | | |
01/27/1999 | Opinion issued | Motion or Writ Granted | |
12/30/1998 | Supplement Received or Filed | | |
12/29/1998 | Letter from the Court | | |
12/10/1998 | petition for writ of habeas corpus | | |
12/10/1998 | Letter setting hearing and brief date Hab. Cor. | | |
12/10/1998 | Order Entered | | |
12/10/1998 | Created for Data Conversion -- an event inserted to correspond to the beginning of a process | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
06/17/2008 | Case Stored | Case destroyed |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Brandon Torrez | Civil - Ad Litem | Ms. Sheila J. Smith |
Pauline Starr, Intervenor | Real party in interest | Mr. James C. Boone Jr. |
John Hobson | SHERIFF | Mr. John Hobson |
Teri Lynn (Torrez) Pace | Real party in interest | Mr. John C. Van Meter |
Torrez, In Re: Florentino Gome | Relator | Mr. William M. House Jr. |
Trial Court Information
3rd District Court
Anderson
Honorable James N. Parsons
38077