judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

SANDERS, EARL S. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-1388
Short Caption:SANDERS, EARL S. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Attempted Robbery
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:Filed Date:10/06/1982

Opening Event Date:10/06/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:10/17/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:02/24/1984
Argued/Submitted:05/10/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Frances M. D'Antuono NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Joan Ann Barton YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901SANDERS, EARL S. UNITED STATES
10/06/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
10/17/1983FiledRecord Completed
02/24/1984FiledBriefing Completed
05/10/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/01/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition