judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 5th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 05-81-01299-CR
05-81-01299-CR
12/14/1981
Burglary of a Habitation
Paul Wayne Lloyd, Jr.
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
02/11/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requestedState
11/05/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requestedAppellant
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
01/19/2017Retention time case file will be retainedRetain
10/17/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
09/26/1983Petition for discretionary review disposed by Court of Criminal AppealsRefused
06/13/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
06/06/1983Letter issued by the court
06/06/1983Petition for discretionary review filed
05/05/1983Opinion issuedAffirmed
02/11/1983Brief filed - oral argument not requested
01/20/1983Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
12/08/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
11/05/1982Brief filed - oral argument not requested
07/14/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
06/11/1982Motion for extension of time to file brief filed
05/27/1982Letter issued by the court
03/26/1982Reporters record filed
03/26/1982Clerks record filed
03/01/1982Motion filed
12/14/1981Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
05/05/1983Case StoredPermanent retention required in criminal case
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
THE STATE OF TEXASCriminal - State of Texas
Lloyd, Jr., Paul WayneCriminal - Appellant
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 2
F81-10815-HKI
30 years