Case Heading (S-17-0096) | |||||
Case Number: | S-17-0096 | Case Docketed On: | 04/05/2017 | ||
Status: | Closed | ||||
Original Court: | Ninth Judicial District Teton County | Case Type: | Original Proceeding - Petition for writ of review - Extraordinary Relief | ||
Short Title: | DALE B. LEAVITT v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION | ||||
Full Title: | DALE B. LEAVITT, Petitioner, v. STATE OF WYOMING, ex rel., WYOMING DEPARTMENT OF TRANSPORTATION, Respondent. |
- Party Information |
Role | Party Name | Attorney(s) |
Petitioner | Dale B. Leavitt | R. Michael Vang Timothy K. Newcomb |
Respondent | Department of Transportation | Peter K. Michael Misha Westby Michael Thomas Kahler Samuel Stephen Voyles |
- Case Decision Information | |
Issues: | |
Opinion Number: | |
Citation: |
Docketing Filter View |
Display: |
Docket Information | |||||
Filing Date | Document Description | Docket Entry Type | Docket Entry Subtype | Status | |
04/05/2017 | Event - Docketed and indexed | Event | Docketed and indexed | Final | |
04/05/2017 | Petition - Writ - review | Petition | Writ - review | Final | |
04/05/2017 | Fees - Docket fee received | Fees | Docket fee received | Final | |
04/13/2017 | Motion - Stay - other | Motion | Stay - other | Final | |
04/14/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Motion to stay appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/20/2017 | Response/Objection - Petition for review and Motion for Stay of Appeal | Response/Objection | Petition for review | Final | |
04/20/2017 | Event - Hardcopy received - Response to Petition for Judicial Review and Motion to Stay Appeal | Event | Hardcopy received | Final | |
04/25/2017 | Order Denying Petition for Judicial Review | Order | Petition for review - deny | Final | |
04/25/2017 | Event - Case closed | Event | Case closed | Final |