judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 14th Court Of Appeals

Case: 14-81-00827-CR
14-81-00827-CR
12/15/1981
Murder-Voluntary Manslaughter
Johnson, Michael Anthony
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
02/11/1985No description available.DENIED
01/31/1985No description available.
01/14/1985Mandate Issued
11/29/1984Mtn.for Rehearing DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO SE,STAOVERRULED
11/15/1984Motion for Rehearing FILED-ANT,APE,REL,RES,STA
11/01/1984Opinion issuedAFFIRMED
10/18/1984Submission
08/01/1983AM CUR, OTHER,
06/02/1983Ex.time brief DISPOSED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STADENIED
05/27/1983Ex.file brief FILED-ANT,APE,APP,PRO,REL,RES,STA
01/28/1983No description available.
01/06/1983Order Entered
04/07/1982Record Filed (Both records FILED)
12/15/1981Notice of Appeal FILED - APP
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/14/1985Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - State of TexasCalvin A. Hartmann
Mannesman Piper & Steel CorporationCriminal - AppellantCraig A. Washington
Trial Court Information
178th District Court
Harris
320,546
7 years