judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

MACKALL JR., GILBERT A. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 82-CF-1188
Short Caption:MACKALL JR., GILBERT A. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Burglary
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F364-81Filed Date:08/13/1982

Opening Event Date:08/13/1982Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:06/21/1983Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:11/16/1983
Argued/Submitted:01/17/1984
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher NN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Bruce Z. Marshack YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901MACKALL JR., GILBERT A. JR UNITED STATES
08/13/1982FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
06/21/1983FiledRecord Completed
11/16/1983FiledBriefing Completed
01/17/1984FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/23/1984FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition