judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00050-CR
01-82-00050-CR
12/15/1981
Marijuana Possession
Beasley, Richard J.
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
11/16/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
06/15/1983Higher court decisionReversed & Remanded to Tr. Ct.
02/23/1983No description available.Grant motion
12/22/1982No description available.
11/11/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
10/13/1982Submission
10/13/1982Submitted
06/15/1982Brief filed
05/17/1982Brief filed
04/16/1982Record filed
12/15/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
11/16/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - Appellant
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
176th District Court
Harris
340,011
4 years probated + $750.