judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

BRENBARGER VS. FORTIN

Case Information: 34671
Short Caption:BRENBARGER VS. FORTINCourt:Supreme Court
Related Case(s): 32661
Lower Court Case(s):Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D196252Classification:Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
08/16/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/16/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-07631
08/16/1999Notice/OutgoingIssued Notice to Pay Supreme Court Filing Fee. Due Date: 10 days
09/24/1999Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. On August 16, 1999, we directed appellant to pay the supreme court filing fee. Appellant has failed to pay the fee or otherwise respond to our directive, and we conclude that appellant has abandoned this appeal. "ORDER this appeal dismissed." SNP99B-WM/MS/NB 99-09149
10/20/1999RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 99-10232
10/20/1999Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
11/08/1999RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on October 28, 1999. 99-10232