judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

ZACHARIA CHARLES COHEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING

Case Heading (S-07-0082)
Case Number:S-07-0082Case Docketed On:04/12/2007
Status:Closed
Original Court:Seventh Judicial District Natrona CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Criminal - Offenses Against the Person 6-2-101 - 6-2-509
Short Title:ZACHARIA CHARLES COHEN v. THE STATE OF WYOMING
Full Title:ZACHARIA CHARLES COHEN, Appellant (Defendant), v. THE STATE OF WYOMING, Appellee (Plaintiff).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantZacharia Charles CohenDiane M. Lozano
Tina N. Olson
Donna D. Domonkos
AppelleeThe State of WyomingTerry L. Armitage
D. Michael Pauling
Paul S. Rehurek
Bruce A. Salzburg

- Case Decision Information
Issues:Criminal Law -Search and Seizure -Traffic Stop, Criminal Law -Sufficiency of Evidence
Opinion Number:2008 WY 78
Citation:191 P.3d 956

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
04/12/2007Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
04/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from district courtNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from district courtFinal
04/12/2007Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
04/20/2007Notice-Incoming - Other - Court Reporter's certicate of completionNotice-IncomingOtherFinal
05/29/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
05/30/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
06/27/2007Motion - Extension of time - brief of appellantMotionExtension of time - briefFinal
06/27/2007Order - Grant - extension of timeOrderGrant - extension of timeFinal
08/13/2007Brief - Appellant; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppellantFinal
09/25/2007Brief - Appellee; received copy of brief on disk; and received copy of designation of record on appeal.BriefAppelleeFinal
10/10/2007Order - Oral argument scheduledOrderOral argument scheduledFinal
10/12/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Tina Kerin on behalf of appellant.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/15/2007Notice-Outgoing - Request for transmitted record on appealNotice-OutgoingRequest for transmitted record on appealFinal
10/15/2007Correspondence - Incoming - Received letter from appellant regarding Donna Domonkos and issues he wanted briefed.CorrespondenceIncomingFinal
10/15/2007Correspondence - Outgoing - Sent letter to appellant informing that Ms. Domonkos was no longer at the public defender's office and to contact that office with any concerns.CorrespondenceOutgoingFinal
10/17/2007Notice-Incoming - Receipt acknowledgment - oral argument setting - Paul S. Rehurek on behalf of appellee.Notice-IncomingReceipt acknowledgment - oral argument settingFinal
10/19/2007Record - Transmitted record on appeal from District Court Clerk, seven volumes. Volumes I - III, Original Papers; Volumes IV - V, Transcripts; Volume VI, Confidential Information; Volume VII, ExhibitsRecordTransmitted record on appealFinal
10/19/2007Notice-Outgoing - Record filedNotice-OutgoingRecord filedFinal
11/14/2007Event - Oral argument presented. Argued before full court (Tina Kerin, Appellate Counsel for appellant; Paul S. Rehurek, Senior Assistant Attorney General for appellee) and taken under advisement.EventOral argument presentedFinal
11/14/2007Notice-Internal - Oral argument noticeNotice-InternalOral argument noticeFinal
07/14/2008Opinion - Opinion and journal order affirming, Justice Golden writing for the CourtOpinionOpinion and journal orderFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - MandateNotice-OutgoingMandateFinal
07/30/2008Record - Record returned to district courtRecordRecord returned to district courtFinal
07/30/2008Notice-Outgoing - Record return letterNotice-OutgoingRecord return letterFinal
07/30/2008Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
08/04/2008Service - Certified mail signature return card. Record signed for 7/31/08.ServiceCertified mail signature return cardFinal