judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals

Case: 01-82-00036-CR
01-82-00036-CR
12/15/1981
Other Felony
Sanchez, Albert
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
08/11/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
08/01/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
03/17/1983Motion to extend time to file brief disposed.Grant motion
03/04/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
02/01/1983Motion to extend time to file brief filed.
01/14/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/14/1983Mandate issued - criminal or civil
11/24/1982Opinion issuedReversed and Remanded
10/13/1982Submission
10/13/1982Submitted
06/14/1982Brief filed
04/15/1982Brief filed
03/24/1982Record filed
02/09/1981Notice of appeal filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
01/14/1983Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateCriminal - State of Texas
Trial Court Information
182nd District Court
Harris
323,014
16 years