Case: 00-0739
00-0739
07/19/2000
Petition for Review originally filed as 53.7(f)
COASTAL TRANSPORT CO.
CROWN CENTRAL PETROLEUM CORP. and LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/30/2000 | Response to Petition | Respondent | On behalf of Crown Central Petroleum Corporation | |
09/22/2000 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | appendix attached | |
09/22/2000 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behlaf of Coastal Transport Co. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/23/2001 | Case Stored | Location G02/19-J-1. | | |
03/02/2001 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Order mailed to the Court of Appeals. | | |
12/07/2000 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | Justice Hankinson not sitting | |
10/30/2000 | Response to Petition | On behalf of Crown Central Petroleum Corporation | | |
10/24/2000 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
10/23/2000 | Response Waiver filed | on behalf of Liberty Mutual Insurance Company | | |
09/22/2000 | Appendix Filed | appendix attached | | |
09/22/2000 | Petition for Review | On behlaf of Coastal Transport Co. | | |
08/23/2000 | Petition due | Pet due 9/22/00."No further extensions of time will be considered." | | |
08/23/2000 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | "No further extensions of time will be considered." | |
08/21/2000 | Second Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | On behalf of Coastal Transport Co. | | |
07/20/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review disposed | Filing granted | m/e/t to file petition for review is granted; petition is due 8-23-00 | |
07/20/2000 | Petition due | petition for review is due August 23, 2000. | | |
07/19/2000 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Petition for Review filed | on behalf of Coastal Transport Co. (to seperate petitions were filing in coa under same no.) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
03/23/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored. | G02/19-J-1 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
CROWN CENTRAL PETROLEUM CORP. | Respondent | Mr. John L. Hagan |
LIBERTY MUTUAL INSURANCE CO. | Respondent | Mr. Robert D. Arredondo |
COASTAL TRANSPORT CO. | Petitioner | Ms. Dana Livingston Mr. Robert M. 'Randy' Roach Jr. |
TRANSPORT INSURANCE CO. | Other interested party | Mr. Robert M. Greenberg |
Court of Appeals Information:
14-99-00135-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
20 SW3d 119, 03-30-00
14th Court of Appeals
Honorable NORMAN LEE
Trial Court Information
189th District Court
Harris
Honorable Carolyn Marks Johnson
95-42745-B