judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 1st Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 01-81-00874-CV
01-81-00874-CV
12/15/1981
Miscellaneous/other civil
Price, David and John H. Hurbrough
Bank of the Southwest, N.A.
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
03/30/1984Mandate issued - criminal or civil
01/19/1984Opinion issuedDismissed
12/22/1983Dismissal notice on brief
11/08/1982Notice of dismissal
12/30/1981Motion to extend time to file statement of facts
12/15/1981Transcript filed
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
03/30/1984Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
StateAppellee
StateAppellant
StateAppellee
Trial Court Information
164th District Court
Harris
Honorable PETER S. SOLITO
1,091,861