Case: 01-0194
01-0194
03/12/2001
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
ROBERT RICHMOND, as legal guardian of DONALD COMBEST RICHMOND, non compos mentis, and PACESETTER PERSONNEL SERVICE, INC.
L.D. BRINKMAN & COMPANY (TEXAS), INC.
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
03/12/2001 | Appendix Filed | Petitioner | APPENDIX ATTACHED TO THE PETITION | |
03/12/2001 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | ON BEHALF OF ROBERT RICHMOND, as legal guardian of DONALD COMBEST RICHMOND, & PACESETTER PERSONNEL SERVICE, INC. | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
07/16/2001 | Case Stored | G02/20-G-5 | | |
06/11/2001 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | Final order mailed to the Court of Appeals. | | |
04/26/2001 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied with Justice not sitting. | (Justice Enoch not sitting) | |
03/20/2001 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
03/19/2001 | Response Waiver filed | on behalf of L.D. Brinkman & Company, Inc. | | |
03/12/2001 | Appendix Filed | APPENDIX ATTACHED TO THE PETITION | | |
03/12/2001 | Petition for Review | ON BEHALF OF ROBERT RICHMOND, as legal guardian of DONALD COMBEST RICHMOND, & PACESETTER PERSONNEL SERVICE, INC. | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
07/16/2001 | Case Stored | Case stored. | Location G02/20-G-5 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
RICHMOND, ROBERT | Petitioner | Mr. David R. Weiner |
L.D. BRINKMAN & COMPANY (TEXAS | Respondent | Mr. Greg K. Winslett Mr. James K. Peden III |
PACESETTER PERSONNEL SERVICE | Petitioner | Mr. William M. Hayner Jr. |
RICHMOND, ROBERT | Other interested party | Jeffrey J. Kroll |
RICHMOND, ROBERT AS LEGAL GUAR | Petitioner | Ms. Paula J. Walsh Mr. Kent C. Krause |
Court of Appeals Information:
05-99-01703-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
___ SW3d ___, 01-23-01
5th Court of Appeals
Honorable KERRY P. FITZGERALD
Trial Court Information
192nd District Court
Dallas
Honorable Merrill Hartman
DV98-00911-K