judyrecords
search tips
730 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

LOVE, ODELL EUGENE ALEXANDER, HARRY

Case Information: 85-CV-0478
Short Caption:LOVE, ODELL EUGENE ALEXANDER, HARRYClassification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA10350-83Filed Date:04/26/1985

Opening Event Date:04/26/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/05/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:04/04/1986
Argued/Submitted:06/16/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantOdell Eugene NPro SeN
AppelleeHarry Toussaint NPro SeN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901LOVE, ODELL EUGENE ALEXANDER, HARRY
04/26/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/05/1985FiledRecord Completed
04/04/1986FiledBriefing Completed
06/16/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
06/30/1986FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition