judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas 9th Court Of Appeals Record

Case: 09-81-00146-CR
09-81-00146-CR
12/14/1981
Burglary
Palmer, Herman
Texas, The State of
No
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionDocument
No briefs.
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionDocument
12/14/1982Mandate Issued
10/27/1982Opinion issuedAffirmed
01/21/1982Brief Filed
01/11/1982Brief Filed
12/14/1981Transcript & SOF Filed (Crim)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason Set
12/14/1982Case StoredCase stored
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
No Party.
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court
Jefferson
Honorable Larry Gist
39427
30 Years