Case: 05-81-01293-CR
05-81-01293-CR
12/14/1981
Aggravated Rape
Odell Brewster
The State of Texas
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
01/19/2017 | Retention time case file will be retained | Retain | |
03/18/1983 | Opinion issued | Affirmed | |
05/27/1982 | Motion for extension of time to file brief filed | | |
03/26/1982 | Clerks record filed | | |
12/14/1981 | Notice of appeal filed in court of appeals | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
03/18/1983 | Case Stored | Permanent retention required in criminal case |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
THE STATE OF TEXAS | Criminal - State of Texas | |
Brewster, Odell | Criminal - Appellant |
Trial Court Information
Criminal District Court No. 2
Dallas
Honorable Dallas Criminal District Court Judge, Criminal District Court No. 2
F81-30667-HKI
50 years