Case Information: 39145 | |||
Short Caption: | GREANEY (JEREMIAH) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR011796 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Pretrial |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/04/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/04/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Fast Track. Fast track appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Fast Track Notice mailed to all counsel.) | 02-02273 | |
02/20/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Show Cause. Response due from appellant: 20 days from the date of this order. All deadlines for the filing of documents pursuant to NRAP 3C are suspended until further order of this court. | 02-03276 | |
03/18/2002 | Motion | Filed Response to Order to Show Cause. Show Cause Statement in Support of Appeal. | 02-04854 | |
05/31/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER this appeal DISMISSED." SNP02-CY/DA/ML | 02-09538 | |
06/25/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-09601 | |
06/25/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
06/28/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on June 25, 2002. | 02-09601 |