Case: 99-0216
99-0216
03/11/1999
Petition for Review under Tex. R. App. P. 53.1
ERIC ECKARDT
DORSEY BRYAN HARDEMAN
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/24/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/23/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/22/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
03/11/1999 | Petition for Review | Petitioner | On behalf of Eric Eckardt | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/24/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/23/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
11/22/2019 | Case File from Microfiche | These electronic documents are derived from scans of microfiche duplicates of the original paper case file. Refer to file-stamped dates on the documents for the actual file dates. These copies may not contain the entire original case file. Contact the Texas State Library and Archives Commission to review the original case file. | ||
08/25/1999 | Case Stored | | | |
08/25/1999 | Notice sent to Court of Appeals | order sent to coa | | |
05/13/1999 | Petition for Review disposed | Denied | | |
04/13/1999 | Case forwarded to Court | | | |
04/07/1999 | Response Waiver filed | on behalf of Dorsey Bryan Hardeman | | |
03/11/1999 | Petition for Review | On behalf of Eric Eckardt | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
08/25/1999 | Case Stored | Case stored. | 18-I-3 |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
HARDEMAN, DORSEY BRYAN | Respondent | Mr. David Sochia Mr. James B. Ewbank II Mr. Todd A. Clark |
ECKARDT, ERIC | Petitioner | Mr. Tim Labadie |
FLIGHT SOURCE INTERNATIONAL, N | Other interested party | Mr. Tim Labadie |
Court of Appeals Information:
03-98-00274-CV
Affirmed [duplicate 3]
RULE 47.7, 01-28-99
3rd Court of Appeals
Honorable J. WOODFIN JONES
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No 2
Travis
Honorable J. David Phillips
233,984