judyrecords
592 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9798
A-9798
08/23/1963
Application for Writ of Error
HUGH WEATHERFORD, ET AL.
AETNA INSURANCE COMPANY, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
11/12/1964Motion for RehearingPetitioner
01/14/1964Reply to ResponseRespondent
01/10/1964Response to Brief filedPetitioner
12/12/1963Supplemental Brief filedRespondent
10/07/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/06/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
08/23/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
11/18/1964Response to Motion filed
11/12/1964Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/28/1964Dissenting opinion issued.
10/28/1964Opinion issued
01/14/1964Reply to Response
01/10/1964Response to Brief filed
12/12/1963Supplemental Brief filed
10/23/1963Document received (See Remarks)
10/23/1963Document received (See Remarks)
10/07/1963Reply to Response
09/06/1963Response to Petition
08/23/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Aetna Insurance Company, et al.Respondent
Hugh Weatherford, et al.Petitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information