judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

DRAKE (MICHAEL) VS. STATE C/W 34146/34147

Case Information: 34148
Short Caption:DRAKE (MICHAEL) VS. STATE C/W 34146/34147Court:Supreme Court
Consolidated: 34146 *, 34147 , 34148Related Case(s): 50628 , 51286 , 68857 , 68857-COA
Lower Court Case(s):Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR982597Classification:Criminal Appeal - Fast Track - Direct
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
05/05/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee Waived.
05/05/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. 99-03599
05/11/1999Order/CounselFiled Order/Fast Track/Counsel. Appellant filed his notice of appeal in proper person.This appeal is governed by NRAP 3C. Attorney Mary Pat Barry shall file the transcript request form within10 days and a fast track statement within 40 days. 99-03811
06/11/1999Other Incoming DocumentReceived Proper Person Document. Appellant's Request for Submission of Motion Memorandum/Points & Authorities. (Case Nos. 34146, 34147 and 34148).
06/15/1999MotionFiled Stipulation. Stipulation to Consolidate Appeals (Nos. 34146, 34147, 34148).
06/21/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order/Consolidation. On June 15, 1999, the parties to these appeals filed a stipulation to consolidate these appeals. The stipulation is approved, and these appeals are consolidated for all appellate purposes. NRAP 3(b). Nos. 34146, 34147, 34148.
06/22/1999MotionFiled Motion to Extend Time. 99-05419
06/24/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order Granting Motion. The fast track statement shall be filed and served no later than July 21, 1999. Nos. 34146, 34147, 34148
07/08/1999Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Second Notice of Appeal filed by proper person Appellant. 99-06095
07/19/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Statement. (Case Nos. 34146, 34147 and 34148).
07/19/1999AppendixFiled Joint Appendix. (Case Nos. 34146, 34147 and 34148).
07/28/1999Order/IncomingFiled District Court Order. Filed certified copy of order filed in district court on 7/26/99 appointing Washoe County Public Defender as counsel for appellant. Nos. 34146, 34147, 34148. 99-07170
08/10/1999Fast Track BriefFiled Fast Track Response. (nos. 34146; 34147; & 34148). 99-07382
08/25/1999Order/Procedural Order. As of this date, Court Reporter Gail Willsey has failed to file a copy of the transcripts with this court. Accordingly, the court reporter shall file the transcripts with the clerk of this court within 10 days of the date of this order or shall show cause why she should not be sanctioned. Nos. 34146, 34147, 34148. 99-07957
09/10/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Letter from Court Reporter DeeDee Jensen regarding mailing of 08/25/99 order (nos. 34146/34147/34148). 99-08566
10/01/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Sunshine Reporting Services shall provide copies of the rough draft transcript to this court within 10 days of this order. Nos. 34146, 34147, 34148. 99-09438
11/22/1999Order/Procedural Order. Sunshine Reporting Services shall provide copies of the rough draft transcripts to this court within 10 days of this order or show cause why it should not be sanctioned for failure to comply with this court's October 1, 1999 order. Nos. 34146, 34147, 34148. 99-11646
12/06/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. Although appellant is represented by counsel and has not been granted permission to file documents in proper person, this court has received several proper person documents from appellant. We conclude that the relief requested in the proper person documents received on May 25, 1999 and June 11, 1999 is not warranted. fn1[On November 15, 1999, this court received a second proper person request for submission of the May 25, 1999 request for appointment of counsel. We conclude that the relief requested is not warranted]. On November 11, 1999, this court received a proper person document. We conclude that the relief requested is not warranted. We conclude that the relief requested in the proper perosn document filed on November 15, 1999 is not warranted. We decline to grant appellant permission to proceed in proper person. In the future, any proper person documents submitted to this court shall be returned, unfiled by the clerk of this court. Appellant shall proceed hereafter by and through counsel. Nos. 34146, 34147, 34148. 99-12209
12/20/1999TranscriptFiled Rough Draft Transcript of Proceedings. April 13, 1999 Proceedings: Court Reporter: Gail R. Willsey. 99-12867
02/25/2000Order/DispositionalFiled Order Dismissing Appeal. "ORDER these appeals dismissed." NNP99B-CY/DA/ML Nos. 34146, 34147, 34148. 00-03020
03/22/2000RemittiturIssued Remittitur. 00-04547
03/22/2000Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
03/30/2000RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on March 27, 2000. 00-04547