Case Information: 39139 | |||
Short Caption: | SCHAEFER VS. PAT CLARK PONTIAC | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A440270 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/28/2002 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/01/2002 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from J. Michael Schaefer--check no. 2298. | ||
02/01/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 02-02143 | |
02/12/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 02-02733 | |
03/28/2002 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. | 02-05581 | |
03/28/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
06/06/2002 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellant Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | 02-09926 | |
07/03/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We grant the motion and hereby dismiss this appeal." The parties shall bear their own attorneys fees and costs, it any. Fn1 [We grant appellant leave to file documents in proper person for the limited purpose of filing his motion to dismiss. The clerk of this court shall file the motion provisionally received on June 6, 2002.] SNP02-CY/DA/ML. | 02-11373 | |
07/03/2002 | Motion | Filed Proper Person Motion. Appellant Motion to Dismiss Appeal. | ||
07/03/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice. Issued Notice of Return of Record. Record on Appeal returned this day. | ||
07/16/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Letter: Entered Receipt for Documents. Received by County Clerk on July 5, 2002. | 02-12211 |