Case Information: 34151 | |||
Short Caption: | WITHERS VS. CITY OF LAS VEGAS | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - A389295 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - General - Other |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Disposition Filed/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | 05/17/1999 / Segel, M. | SP Status: | Completed |
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | How Submitted: | ||
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
05/05/1999 | Filing Fee | Received Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 from Miles & Cooper--check no. 020707. | ||
05/05/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 99-03606 | |
05/17/1999 | Settlement Notice | Issued Notice: Assignment to Settlement Program. Settlement Judge: M. Nelson Segel. (Briefing and preparation of transcripts suspended pending further order of this court.) | ||
05/17/1999 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
05/17/1999 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Cross-Appeal. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant/cross-respondent (City of Las Vegas).) | 99-04024 | |
05/25/1999 | Notice/Outgoing | Letter. | ||
06/01/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. from Appellant/Cross-Respondent City of Las Vegas. | 99-04484 | |
06/04/1999 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 99-04652 | |
10/25/1999 | Settlement Program Report | Filed Interim Settlement Program Report. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this matter. | 99-10429 | |
12/01/1999 | Settlement Order/Procedural | Filed Order: No Settlement/Briefing Reinstated. The parties were unable to agree to a settlement of this appeal. Appellant/Cross-Respondent and Respondent/Cross-Appellant: 15 days to comply with NRAP 9(a); Appellant/Cross-Respondent: 120 days to file opening brief and appendix. Briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). | 99-11960 | |
12/17/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. April 5, 1999 Transcripts requested: To Court Reporter: Laurie Webb & Associates. | 99-12840 | |
12/21/1999 | Transcript Request | Filed Request for Transcript of Proceedings. Transcripts requested: April 5, 1999. To Court Reporter: Linda Osborne c/o Laurie Webb & Associates. | 99-12984 | |
01/14/2000 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: Monday, April 5, 1999 at 9:00 a.m. Court Reporter: Linda M. Osborne. Mailed on: no date-shipped by UPS. | 00-00662 | |
03/20/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation. Stipulation to Extend Time for Filing Briefs in Civil Appeal and to Correct Caption. | 00-04431 | |
03/20/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. Motion for Additional Extension of Time | 00-04433 | |
04/03/2000 | Motion | Filed Motion to Extend Time. | 00-05313 | |
04/10/2000 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. We approve the March 20, 2000, stipulation and grant the March 20, 2000, joint motion. The clerk of this court shall amend the caption in this matter to reflect that George A. Withers is the appellant/cross-respondent and the City of Las Vegas is the respondent/cross-appellant. Appellant/cross-respondent George A. Withers shall have to and including June 30, 2000, to file and serve the opening brief and appendix. Thereafter, briefing shall proceed in accordance with NRAP 31(a)(1). Appellant Withers' April 3, 2000, motion is denied as moot. | 00-05644 | |
07/27/2000 | Motion | Filed Stipulation/Dismiss Appeal. Stipulation to Dismiss with Prejudice. | 00-13045 | |
08/03/2000 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties, " . . . this appeal and cross-appeal are dismissed." The parties shall bear their own costs. SNP/CLK | 00-13402 | |
08/03/2000 | Case Status Update | Case Closed. No remittitur issued. |