Case Information: 85-CV-1395 | |||
Short Caption: | GORHAM, JAMES OMNI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Lead: | 85-CV-1221 | Consolidated: | 85-CV-1395 |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA5138-83 | Filed Date: | 09/23/1985 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/23/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | ||
Briefs Completed: | |||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: | 08/04/1989 |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
|
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | GORHAM, JAMES OMNI CONSTRUCTION COMPANY INC., ET AL | |||
01/01/1903 | NOTE - 01 CON 85-1221 NOTE - 01 NOTE - 02 042286 ORDER: GRANT APLT MO TO NOTE - 02 STAY PENDING DECISION IN NOTE - 03 APPEAL NO. 85-543, ESTEP, et NOTE - 03 al. v. CONSTRUCTION GENERAL, NOTE - 04 INC., et al. NOTE - 04 | |||
09/23/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
12/13/1985 | ORDER APLT IN 10 DAYS OTSC - DISM (NO CAS & FEE) SL PANELPY SCDATE 100885 SCHPRD CAS | |||
12/19/1985 | RECEIVED RECORD ON APPEAL GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/20/1985 | RECEIVED APLT'S RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/30/1985 | APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO SHOW CAUSE ORDER GG PANEL SCDATE 122385 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
12/30/1985 | $50.00 DOCKETING FEE GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/30/1985 | RECORD ON APPEAL (NO TRANSCRIPT) GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
12/30/1985 | RECEIVED CIVIL APPEAL STATEMENT GG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/02/1986 | $5 PAID TO DC TREASURER VS PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
01/07/1986 | ORDER NO 7A, APLT BR DUE W/IN 40 DAY EBP PANELPY SCDATE 010286 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
01/30/1986 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO CONSOLIDATE APPEALS WITH 85-1221 JB PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
02/12/1986 | APPELLANT'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE BRIEF FOR 35 DAYS RJG PANEL SCDATE 021786 SCHPRD BA | |||
03/03/1986 | ORDER GRANTG MO TO CONSOL 85-1221 & 85-1395; BRIEF OF APLT DUE IN 40 DAYS. CWC PANELPY SCDATE 021186 SCHPRD OPE | |||
03/27/1986 | APPELLANT'S MOTION FOR STAY PENDING DECISION IN 85-543 GG PANEL SCDATE 041486 SCHPRD BA | |||
04/22/1986 | ORDER SEE NOTE FIELDS 02 - 04. EBP PANELPY SCDATE 040886 SCHPRD OPE | |||
07/20/1988 | ORDER PARTIES TO FL MEMORANDA IN 20 DAYS ADDRESSING EFFECT OF DEC IN 85-577 ON THIS APPEAL. ACG PANELPY SCDATE 020187 SCHPRD CHECK | |||
08/08/1988 | APPELLANT'S ANSWER/RESPONSE TO ORDER 7/20/88 MLH PANEL SCDATE 080988 SCHPRD ANSA | |||
09/06/1988 | APLE MOTION TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE ANSWER/RESPONSEOF HARRY HOBBS IN 85-577 FOR 1 WEEK EXT. TO 9/13/88 TO MRRB RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
09/19/1988 | LETTER OF PETITIONER & AMICI IN 85-577 PURSUANT TO RULE 28(K) RJG PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD | |||
03/22/1989 | ORDER APLT OTSC IN 10 DAYS WHY JUDGMENT SHOULD NOT BE SUMMARILY AFFIRMED. ACG PANELRO SCDATE 080988 SCHPRD ANSE | |||
07/13/1989 | AFFIRMED JUDGMENT AFFIRMING JUDGMENT ON APPEAL IN LIGHT OF DEC IN 85-543. ACG PANELBETE SCDATE 041389 SCHPRD Q | |||
07/13/1989 | DISP NO - 01 DISP - AF METH -JDG JUDGE -PC CITE | |||
08/04/1989 | MANDATE ISSUED PANEL SCDATE 000000 SCHPRD |