Case: A-9819
A-9819
09/20/1963
Application for Writ of Error
THOMAS D. FERGUSON, ET UX.
AETNA CASUALTY AND SURETY COMPANY, ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY, DONALD E. BOWLES, DBA SHELTON BOWELS INSURANCE AGENCY
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
11/13/1963 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
10/07/1963 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/07/1963 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
10/01/1963 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/20/1963 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/03/1963 | Letter Filed | | ||
11/18/1963 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/18/1963 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
11/13/1963 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
10/07/1963 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/07/1963 | Response to Petition | | ||
10/03/1963 | Motion for Extension of Time to File Response | Filing granted | | |
10/01/1963 | Response to Petition | | ||
09/20/1963 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Refused | | |
09/20/1963 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Donald E. Bowles, dba Shelton Bowels Insurance Agency | Respondent | |
ARGONAUT INSURANCE COMPANY | Respondent | |
Aetna Casualty and Surety Company | Respondent | |
Thomas D. Ferguson, et ux. | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information