judyrecords
591 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

Case: A-9806
A-9806
08/28/1963
Application for Writ of Error
DALLAS TRANSIT COMPANY
E. D. YOUNG, JESSE FORD, E. D. YOUNG, ET AL.
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
10/14/1963Response to Reply filedRespondent
10/02/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
09/18/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
09/12/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
08/28/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
10/14/1963Response to Reply filed
10/02/1963Reply to Response
09/18/1963Response to Petition
09/12/1963Response to Petition
08/28/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
08/28/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Jesse FordRespondent
E. D. YoungRespondent
E. D. Young, et al.Respondent
Dallas Transit CompanyPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information