Case Information: 84-CV-0774 | |||
Short Caption: | TRAVERS JR., MATTHEW J. BEATLEY, PAUL F. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA5679-82 | Filed Date: | 05/31/1984 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 05/31/1984 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 10/15/1986 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 12/29/1986 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | |||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | Matthew Travers | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | Paul F. Beatley | N | Pro Se | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | TRAVERS JR., MATTHEW J. BEATLEY, PAUL F. ET AL | |||
01/01/1906 | NEWTONJ WITHDRAWN (7/22/86) | |||
05/31/1984 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
10/15/1986 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
12/29/1986 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
05/13/1987 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |