judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court Record

MRS. F. W. BRIDGMAN v. W. T. MOORE

Case: A-185
A-185
05/19/1944
Application for Writ of Error
MRS. F. W. BRIDGMAN
W. T. MOORE
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/05/1944Motion for RehearingPetitioner
08/28/1944Response to PetitionRespondent
05/19/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
08/17/1946Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
12/07/1945Motion to Withdraw FiledFiling granted
12/05/1944Motion for RehearingOverruled
10/09/1944Motion to Strike filed
08/28/1944Response to Petition
06/14/1944Document received (See Remarks)
05/19/1944Application for Writ of Error - FiledFiling granted
05/19/1944Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Mrs. F. W. BridgmanPetitioner
W. T. MooreRespondent
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information