judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

BARTHOLOMEW, JOSEPH C. UNITED STATES

Case Information: 81-CF-0424
Short Caption:BARTHOLOMEW, JOSEPH C. UNITED STATESClassification:Appeals - Criminal Felony - Robbery Related
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:F1121-79Filed Date:03/13/1981

Opening Event Date:03/13/1981Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:08/11/1981Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:10/01/1982
Argued/Submitted:01/06/1983
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Leroy Nesbitt YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John R. Fisher YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Mary A. Mclaughlin YN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901BARTHOLOMEW, JOSEPH C. UNITED STATES
03/13/1981FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
08/11/1981FiledRecord Completed
10/01/1982FiledBriefing Completed
01/06/1983FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
01/07/1983FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition