judyrecords
600 million+
United States Court Cases

Nevada Supreme/Appellate Court Record

WEDDELL VS. WATERS

Case Information: 32438
Short Caption:WEDDELL VS. WATERSCourt:Supreme Court
Lower Court Case(s):Carson City - First Judicial District - 9800446AClassification:Civil Appeal - General - Other
Disqualifications:Case Status:Remittitur Issued/Case Closed
Replacement:Panel Assigned: Panel
To SP/Judge:SP Status:
Oral Argument:Oral Argument Location:
Submission Date:07/30/1998How Submitted:

+ Party Information

Docket Entries
DateTypeDescriptionPending?Document
06/01/1998Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $200.00 (cash).
06/01/1998Notice of Appeal DocumentsFiled Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day.
06/30/1998Other Other. Filed Order within 30 days from the date of this order, the clerk of the district court shall transmit to the clerk of this court the original trial record pertaining to this appeal. 1The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.
07/30/1998Record on Appeal DocumentsFiled Record on Appeal. Vols. 1 and 2.
07/30/1998Case Status Update Submitted for Decision.
10/06/1998Other Other. Received Proper Person Petition for Leave to Appellant Appearing in Proper Person to File Brief (Received the original and 2 copies - 1 returned to Appellant).
07/08/1999Other Other. Filed Order Dismissing Appeal. "We Order this Appeal Dismissed." 1Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from appellant.
07/22/1999Filing Fee Filing Fee due.
08/03/1999Letter/IncomingFiled Letter. Proper Person letter from appellant Rolland P. Weddell in reference to filing fees.
09/28/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. We conclude that appellant is not exempt from paying the Supreme Court filing fee. Appellant shall have 20 days from the date of this order within which to pay the required filing fee. Appellant shall not be permitted to respond to this order with a written brief, motion, or other papers, and we direct the clerk of this court to return any such papers received from appellant with respect to this issue. We caution appellant his failure to pay fee withing 20 days will result in the immediate dismissal of this petition for rehearing.
10/05/1999Filing FeeReceived Filing Fee Paid on Filing. $100.00 on rehearing (cash from Roland Weddell). Issued receipt no. 6311.
10/27/1999Order/ProceduralFiled Order. This court dismissed appellant's appeal on July 8, 1999. On July 22, 1999, appellant submitted a proper person petition for rehearing. Appellant has not been granted leave to proceed in proper person, and the petition for rehearing has therefore not been filed. We have determined that a response to the petition would be helpful to this court. Respondents shall have 20 days from the date of this order to submit a response to the petition for rehearing.
11/17/1999Post-Judgment PetitionFiled Answer to Petition for Rehearing. Respondent's Answer to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing. 02-03338
12/07/1999Other Other. Received proper person Motion for Leave to Proceed in Proper Person and Appellant's Reply to Respondent's Answer to Appellant's Petition for Rehearing.
09/10/2001Notice/IncomingFiled Substitution of Attorneys. Day R. Williams, Attorney at Law, hereby substitutes in as attorney for Petitioner (Appellant) Rolland P. Weddell. 01-15245
09/10/2001MotionFiled Motion. Motion to Expedite Decision on Appeal. Expedite the decision on this Petition for Rehearing. 01-15246
01/25/2002MotionFiled Motion. Second Motion to Expedite Petition for Rehearing. 02-01717
01/29/2002MotionFiled Motion to Strike. Respondents' Motion to Strike Appellant's Second Motion to Expedite Petition for Rehearing, and for Sanctions. 02-01915
02/01/2002MotionFiled Response to Motion. Opposition to Motion to Strike and for Sanctions. 02-02161
02/01/2002Other Other. Filed Additional Exhibits in Support of Second Motion to Expedite Petition for Rehearing. 02-02164
04/03/2002Post-Judgment OrderFiled Order/Rehearing Denied. Fn1 [Although appellant was not granted leave to file papers in proper person, we have considered the proper person documents received from him before he retained counsel. We deny appellant's first motion to expedite, filed on September 10, 2001, as moot in light of this order. We grant respondents' motion to strike appellant's second motion to expedite, as it concerns matters outside the record. We deny appellant's motion for sanctions against respondent for filing the motion to strike.] NNP99A-CY/MS/ML. 02-05951
04/18/2002RemittiturIssued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal, Vols. 1 and 2 this day. 02-05968
04/18/2002Case Status Update Remittitur Issued/Case Closed.
04/24/2002RemittiturFiled Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on April 22, 2002. 02-05968