judyrecords
search tips
630 million+
United States Court Cases

Wyoming Supreme/Appellate Court Record

PAT SCHMID v. MIKE SCHMID

Case Heading (06-269)
Case Number:06-269Case Docketed On:11/30/2006
Status:Closed
Original Court:Third Judicial District Sweetwater CountyCase Type:Direct Appeal - Civil - Common Law - Contract
Short Title:PAT SCHMID v. MIKE SCHMID
Full Title:PAT SCHMID, Appellant (Plaintiff), v. MIKE SCHMID, Appellee (Defendant).

- Party Information
RoleParty NameAttorney(s)
AppellantPat SchmidP. Richard Meyer
Robert N. Williams
AppelleeMike SchmidClark D. Stith

- Case Decision Information
Issues:
Opinion Number:
Citation:

Docketing Filter View
Display:

Docket Information
Filing DateDocument DescriptionDocket Entry TypeDocket Entry SubtypeStatus
11/30/2006Notice-Incoming - Record completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedNotice-IncomingRecord completion notice from DC but no NOA receivedFinal
11/30/2006Order - Sanction - notice of appealOrderSanction - notice of appealFinal
11/30/2006Notice-Outgoing - Docketing letterNotice-OutgoingDocketing letterFinal
11/30/2006Event - Docketed and indexedEventDocketed and indexedFinal
01/18/2007Fees - Sanctions received - NOAFeesSanctions received - NOAFinal
01/18/2007Order - Dismiss - want of prosecutionOrderDismiss - want of prosecutionFinal
02/02/2007Petition - ReinstatementPetitionReinstatementFinal
02/20/2007Response/Objection - Other - petition for reinstatementResponse/ObjectionOtherFinal
02/20/2007Order - Deny - reinstatementOrderDenyFinal
02/20/2007Event - Case closedEventCase closedFinal
04/18/2007Fees - Docket fee receivedFeesDocket fee receivedFinal