Case Information: 39154 | |||
Short Caption: | CHARLES, SR. (MONROE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 34481 , 55058 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Washoe Co. - Second Judicial District - CR970274 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Life - Post-Conviction |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 09/13/2002 | How Submitted: | On Briefs |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/06/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/06/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. (Docketing statement mailed to counsel for appellant.) | 02-02445 | |
02/08/2002 | Docketing Statement | Filed Docketing Statement. | 02-02599 | |
03/05/2002 | Transcript | Filed Transcript. Proceedings: 11/30/01. Court Reporter: Denise Phipps. | 02-03961 | |
04/01/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On March 5, 2002, court reporter Denise Phipps filed a certified copy of the transcript for proceeding conducted on November 30, 2001. We note, however, that to date appellant has failed to file a transcript request form with the clerk of this court. Because we are unable to determine whether all transcripts necessary for the review of this appeal have been filed with this court, appellant shall, within 10 days of the date of this order, file and serve a transcript request form setting forth, among other things, the specific trial or hearing dates to be transcribed. | 02-05731 | |
04/03/2002 | Transcript Request | Filed Certificate of No Transcript Request. No additional transcripts will be requested. | 02-05914 | |
06/04/2002 | Motion | Filed Stipulation and Order. Brief due: July 8, 2002. | 02-09740 | |
07/05/2002 | Brief | Filed Opening Brief. Mailed on Reno/Carson Msgr. 7/5/02. | 02-11479 | |
07/05/2002 | Appendix | Filed Joint Appendix. Volumes 1 through 4. | 02-11480 | |
08/01/2002 | Brief | Filed Answering Brief. Mailed on: 07/31/02. | 02-13200 | |
09/13/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. No reply brief filed. | ||
10/16/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." NNP03Y-RR/CY/DA | 02-17967 | |
11/08/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order. On October 16, 2002 this court entered an order of affirmance in this appeal. On October 31, 2002, appellant submitted a proper person petition for rehearing. Appellant is represented by counsel and has not been granted leave to file papers in proper person. The clerk of this court shall return, unfiled, appellant's petition for rehearing received on October 31, 2002. The remittitur is due to issue November 12, 2002. We order the issuance of the remittitur stayed to provide appellant's counsel and opportunity to file a petition for rehearing on appellant's behalf 15 days from the date of this order. If appellant's counsel does not file a petition for rehearing within 15 days of the date of this order, the remittitur shall issue 20 days from the days from the date of this order. Appellant shall proceed hereafter by and through counsel. | 02-19286 | |
11/08/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Letter. to appellant Monroe Charles. Returned unfiled, the original proper person "Motion for Rehearing" received on October 31, 2002. | ||
12/31/2002 | Post-Judgment Order | Filed Order/Rehearing Denied. fn1[Appellant's Counsel Scott Edwards has not filed a notice of withdrawal in this court and therefore technically remains counsel of record in this appeal.] Appellant has not been granted leave to file documents in proper person. Nonetheless, we have considered the arguments presented in appellant's proper person petition, and we conclude that " . . . rehearing is not warranted." NRAP 40(c). NNP03Y-CY/RR/DA | 02-22208 | |
01/28/2003 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 03-00577 | |
01/28/2003 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
02/06/2003 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on January 31, 2003. | 03-00577 |