Case Information: 39155 | |||
Short Caption: | HECKARD (EDDIE) VS. STATE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Related Case(s): | 35083 | ||
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - C157261 | Classification: | Criminal Appeal - Other - Post-Conviction/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 08/12/2002 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/06/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/06/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 02-02447 | |
02/21/2002 | Notice/Outgoing | Issued Notice to Transmit Required Document. Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed on 2/11/02. Due Date: 10 days | ||
02/21/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. | 02-03334 | |
03/01/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed District Court Order/Judgment. Certified copy of Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order filed in district court on 2/11/02. | 02-03821 | |
04/12/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Record due: 120 days. fn1[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] Nos. 39155/39231/39241/ 39279/39280/39310/39314-cases are not consolidated. | 02-06610 | |
08/12/2002 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal Copy. Volumes 1 through 4. | 02-13773 | |
08/12/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
10/15/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." fn20 [We have considered all proper person documents filed or received in this matter, and we conclude that the relief requested is not warranted.] SNP03-MS/ML/NB. | 02-17777 | |
11/12/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. | 02-17886 | |
11/12/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
12/23/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on November 14, 2002. | 02-17886 |