Case Information: 39141 | |||
Short Caption: | IN RE: PARENTAL RIGHTS AS TO RAICHLE | Court: | Supreme Court |
Lower Court Case(s): | Clark Co. - Eighth Judicial District - D269415 | Classification: | Civil Appeal - Family Law - Parental Termination/Proper Person |
Disqualifications: | Case Status: | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed | |
Replacement: | Panel Assigned: | Panel | |
To SP/Judge: | SP Status: | ||
Oral Argument: | Oral Argument Location: | ||
Submission Date: | 03/27/2002 | How Submitted: | On Record |
+ Party Information |
Docket Entries | ||||
Date | Type | Description | Pending? | Document |
02/04/2002 | Filing Fee | Filing Fee Waived. | ||
02/04/2002 | Notice of Appeal Documents | Filed Certified Copy of Notice of Appeal/Proper Person. Appeal docketed in the Supreme Court this day. | 02-02248 | |
02/12/2002 | Order/Procedural | Filed Order/Transmit Record and Directing Response. Original record due: 30 days. fn3[The record shall not include any exhibits filed in the district court.] | 02-02730 | |
03/27/2002 | Record on Appeal Documents | Filed Record on Appeal. | 02-05403 | |
03/27/2002 | Case Status Update | Submitted for Decision. | ||
04/15/2002 | Order/Dispositional | Filed Order of Affirmance. "ORDER the judgment of the district court AFFIRMED." SNP02M-WM/DA/ML | 02-06693 | |
05/10/2002 | Remittitur | Issued Remittitur. Returned Record on Appeal this day. | 02-06850 | |
05/10/2002 | Case Status Update | Remittitur Issued/Case Closed. | ||
05/20/2002 | Remittitur | Filed Remittitur. Received by County Clerk on May 15, 2002. | 02-06850 |