Case: 03-00-00304-CR
03-00-00304-CR
05/03/2000
Appeal From a Pretrial Order
The State of Texas
Kirk Franceschini
No
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Document |
---|---|---|---|
No briefs. |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Document |
---|---|---|---|
12/20/2001 | Case stored | | |
07/27/2000 | Mandate Issued | | |
07/27/2000 | Motion for Dismissal Disposed | Motion or Writ Granted | |
07/26/2000 | Submitted | | |
07/26/2000 | Submission | | |
07/26/2000 | Case ready to be set | | |
07/10/2000 | Motion for Dismissal Filed | | |
06/27/2000 | Clerk's Record Filed | | |
05/22/2000 | Reporter's Record Filed | | |
05/03/2000 | Notice of Appeal Filed | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set |
---|---|---|
07/27/2000 | Case Stored | Case stored |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Franceschini, Kirk | Appellee | Mr. William P. Allison |
The State of Texas | Criminal - Appellant | The Honorable Ken Oden |
Trial Court Information
County Court at Law No. 3
Travis
Honorable David F. Crain
555,412