Case Information: 85-CV-1352 | |||
Short Caption: | RICHARDSON, T. CARLTON GREEN, ROBERT J. | Classification: | Appeals - Civil - Other Civil |
Superior Court or Agency Case Number: | CA7156-82 | Filed Date: | 09/25/1985 |
| |||
Opening Event Date: | 09/25/1985 | Case Status: | Closed |
Record Completed: | 10/28/1986 | Post-Decision Matter Pending: | |
Briefs Completed: | 01/07/1987 | ||
Argued/Submitted: | 05/13/1987 | ||
Disposition: | Next Scheduled Action: | ||
Mandate Issued: |
Party Information | |||||||||
Appellate Role | Party Name | IFP | Attorney(s) | Arguing Attorney | E-Filer | ||||
Appellant | T. Carlton Carlton Richardson | N | Pro Se | N | |||||
Appellant | John Doe | N |
| ||||||
Appellee | John Doe | N |
Events | ||||
Event Date | Status | Description | Result | |
01/01/1901 | RICHARDSON, T. CARLTON GREEN, ROBERT J. ET AL | |||
09/25/1985 | Filed | OPENING EVENT - Opening Event | ||
10/28/1986 | Filed | Record Completed | ||
01/07/1987 | Filed | Briefing Completed | ||
05/13/1987 | Filed | ACTION - Argued / Submitted | ||
07/06/1987 | Filed | OUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition |