judyrecords
search tips
740 million+
United States Court Cases

District Of Columbia Court Of Appeals Record

VESSELS, PAUL E. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA,

Case Information: 85-CV-1318
Short Caption:VESSELS, PAUL E. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA,Classification:Appeals - Civil - Other Civil
Superior Court or Agency Case Number:CA4114-82Filed Date:09/18/1985

Opening Event Date:09/18/1985Case Status:Closed
Record Completed:12/12/1985Post-Decision Matter Pending:
Briefs Completed:03/25/1986
Argued/Submitted:09/25/1986
Disposition:Next Scheduled Action:
Mandate Issued:

Party Information
Appellate RoleParty NameIFPAttorney(s)Arguing AttorneyE-Filer
AppellantJohn Doe N
Robert L. Chernikoff NN
AppellantJohn Doe N
David P. Sutton YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
John Marshall YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charlotte Brookins-Hudson YN
AppelleeJohn Doe N
Charles L. Reischel NN

Events
Event DateStatusDescriptionResult
01/01/1901VESSELS, PAUL E. DISTRICT OF COLUMBIA, ET AL
01/01/1906 MARSHALLJ FOR ELEGANZA INC.
09/18/1985FiledOPENING EVENT - Opening Event
12/12/1985FiledRecord Completed
03/25/1986FiledBriefing Completed
09/25/1986FiledACTION - Argued / Submitted
10/08/1987FiledOUTCOME/DISPOSITION - Outcome-Disposition