judyrecords

584 million
United States Court Cases

Texas Supreme Court

Case: A-9827
A-9827
10/11/1963
Application for Writ of Error
ELEANOR FARRELL
DEAN F. FARRELL
Appellate Briefs
Date Event TypeDescriptionRemarksDocument
12/04/1963Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
11/27/1963Motion for RehearingPetitioner
11/07/1963Supplement to ResponsePetitioner
11/04/1963Reply to ResponsePetitioner
10/25/1963Response to PetitionRespondent
10/17/1963Brief in Support of PetitionPetitioner
10/11/1963Application for Writ of Error - FiledPetitioner
Case Events
DateEvent TypeDispositionRemarksDocument
02/04/1964Letter Filed
12/31/1963Opinion issued on motion for rehearing
12/04/1963Response to Motion filed
12/04/1963Brief in Support of Petition
11/27/1963Motion for Rehearing
11/07/1963Supplement to Response
11/04/1963Reply to Response
10/25/1963Response to Petition
10/17/1963Brief in Support of Petition
10/11/1963Application for Writ of Error - Filed
10/11/1963Document received (See Remarks)
Calendars
Set DateCalendar TypeReason SetRemarks
No Calendar.
Parties
PartyPartyTypeRepresentative
Dean F. FarrellRespondent
Eleanor FarrellPetitioner
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information