Case: A-9814
A-9814
09/11/1963
Application for Writ of Error
TEXAS EMPLOYERS INSURANCE ASSOCIATION
MERRITT MILLER
Appellate Briefs
Date | Event Type | Description | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
10/23/1963 | Motion for Rehearing | Petitioner | | |
09/25/1963 | Response to Petition | Respondent | | |
09/11/1963 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | Petitioner | |
Case Events
Date | Event Type | Disposition | Remarks | Document |
---|---|---|---|---|
12/03/1963 | Letter Filed | | ||
10/28/1963 | Response to Motion filed | | ||
10/23/1963 | Motion for Rehearing | Overruled | | |
09/25/1963 | Response to Petition | | ||
09/11/1963 | Application for Writ of Error - Filed | | ||
09/11/1963 | Document received (See Remarks) | |
Calendars
Set Date | Calendar Type | Reason Set | Remarks |
---|---|---|---|
No Calendar. |
Parties
Party | PartyType | Representative |
---|---|---|
Merritt Miller | Respondent | |
Texas Employers Insurance Association | Petitioner |
Court of Appeals Information:
Trial Court Information